KY HB359 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 141)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 141)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 431 to allow courts to order a person to wear a continuous alcohol monitoring device as a condition of pretrial release; amend KRS 431.520 to conform; amend KRS 533.030 to allow continuous alcohol monitoring as a condition of probation or conditional discharge; amend KRS 533.250 to allow continuous alcohol monitoring during pretrial diversion; amend KRS 403.750 to allow domestic violence protection orders to include continuous alcohol monitoring.
Title
AN ACT relating to continuous alcohol monitoring.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Thompson [D] | Rep. Jeff Hoover [R] | Rep. Mitchel Denham [D] | Rep. Dennis Keene [D] |
Rep. Martha King [D] | Rep. Tanya Pullin [D] | Rep. Jody Richards [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] |
Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 141) |
2014-04-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2014-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2014-04-14 | House | passed 85-0 |
2014-04-14 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-04-14 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-04-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | received in House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-1 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, April 14, 2014 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-03-27 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-27 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2014-03-27 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with floor amendment (2) |
2014-03-11 | House | floor amendment (2) filed |
2014-03-07 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2014-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 7, 2014 |
2014-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-10 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2014-02-07 | House | introduced in House |