KY HB354 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 95)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Appropriate funds for the payment of claims against the Commonwealth; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT authorizing the payment of certain claims against the state which have been duly audited and approved according to law, and have not been paid because of the lapsing or insufficiency of former appropriations against which the claims were chargeable, or the lack of an appropriate procurement document in place, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-10Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 95)
2014-03-31Housedelivered to Governor
2014-03-31Houseenrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2014-03-28Housereceived in House
2014-03-28Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0
2014-03-28Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 28, 2014
2014-03-27Senatereported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill
2014-03-24Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2014-03-24Senate2nd reading
2014-03-24Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2014-03-21Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2014-03-21Senate1st reading
2014-03-21Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2014-03-05Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2014-02-27Senatereceived in Senate
2014-02-26House3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute
2014-02-25Houseplaced in the Consent Orders of the Day Wednesday, February 26, 2014
2014-02-25Housetaken from Rules
2014-02-25House2nd reading, to Rules
2014-02-24Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
2014-02-20Houseposted in committee
2014-02-10Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2014-02-06Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback