KY HB289 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 57)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 57)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 154.12-203 to adjust the membership for the Kentucky Commission on Military Affairs to reflect current commands at Fort Knox and Fort Campbell and to add the Huntington District of the United States Army Corp of Engineers.
Title
AN ACT relating to military affairs.
Sponsors
Rep. Tanya Pullin [D] | Rep. Jeff Greer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 57) |
2014-03-27 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2014-03-27 | House | received in House |
2014-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2014-03-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-20 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-03-19 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-17 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2014-03-13 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 17, 2014 |
2014-03-13 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-02-04 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-30 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB289.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB289/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB289/vote_history.pdf |