KY HB256 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-31 - returned to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-31 - returned to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 209 to define terms; create a new section of KRS Chapter 209 to require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to create and maintain an adult abuse registry; make the registry available electronically; prohibit unsubstantiated findings; prohibit placement of an individual on the registry unless all administrative appeals and judicial proceedings related to the appeal have been completed and upheld; prohibit a long-term-care facility or provider from employing an individual or volunteer whose name appears on the registry; amend KRS 209.140 to permit limited release of information related to the adult abuse registry to long-term-care providers.
Title
AN ACT relating to the protection of vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Kelly Flood [D] | Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] |
Rep. Rita Smart [D] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-03-31 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-11 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 13, 2014 |
2014-03-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-01-30 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-27 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-01-24 | House | introduced in House |