KY HB240 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 222.005 to define "incapacitated by alcohol and/or other drug abuse"; amend KRS 222.431 to permit a person meeting the definition of "incapacitated by alcohol and/or other drug abuse" to be court ordered to treatment; amend KRS 222.433 to require the court to review previous drug or alcohol assessments and drug tests in an order for treatment; require the court to review previous drug or alcohol assessments or drug tests if a respondent has failed to participate in a physical examination.
Title
AN ACT relating to involuntary treatment for alcohol and other drug abuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-17 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2014-03-14 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 17, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-27 | House | reassigned to Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-01-23 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | introduced in House |