KY HB235 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts ch. 117)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #7) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts ch. 117)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #7) [MS Word]
Summary
The State/Executive Branch Budget: appropriate from the General Fund (Tobacco), General Fund, Restricted Funds, Federal Funds, Road Fund, Bond Funds, Agency Bonds, Capital Construction Surplus, Investment Income, Statewide Deferred Maintenance Fund, and other funds, as follows:
Title
AN ACT relating to appropriations providing financing and conditions for the operations, maintenance, support, and functioning of the government of the Commonwealth of Kentucky and its various officers, cabinets, departments, boards, commissions, institutions, subdivisions, agencies, and other state-supported activities.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Rand [D] | Rep. Gregory Stumbo [D] | Rep. Rocky Adkins [D] | Rep. Larry Clark [D] |
Rep. Sannie Overly [D] | Rep. Thomas Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | House | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts ch. 117) |
2014-04-15 | House | veto(es) not acted upon |
2014-04-11 | House | line items vetoed (Acts, ch. 117) |
2014-03-31 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-31 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2014-03-31 | House | Bill passed 89-11 |
2014-03-31 | House | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2014-03-31 | House | received in House |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Bill passed 37-1 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in House |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in Senate |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute |
2014-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute |
2014-03-25 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-25 | House | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute |
2014-03-25 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2014-03-25 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-24 | House | to Rules (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | received in House |
2014-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 25-2-11 with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 24, 2014 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-21 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2014-03-21 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-03-20 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | passed 53-46 with floor amendments (11-title) and (14) |
2014-03-13 | House | floor amendment (1) defeated |
2014-03-13 | House | 3rd reading |
2014-03-13 | House | floor amendment (16) filed to floor amendment (14) |
2014-03-13 | House | floor amendment (15) filed |
2014-03-12 | House | floor amendment (14) filed |
2014-03-11 | House | floor amendments (2) and (7) withdrawn |
2014-03-11 | House | floor amendments (2) (3) (4) (5) (6) (7) (8) (9) (10) (12) and (13) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (11-title) filed |
2014-03-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 12, 2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-07 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2014-03-05 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2014-03-05 | House | 2nd reading |
2014-03-05 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2014-03-04 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2014-03-04 | House | 1st reading |
2014-03-04 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2014-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-23 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | introduced in House |