KY HB234 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 32)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 32)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 2 to create "Korean War Armistice Day"; request the Governor to proclaim annually.
Title
AN ACT relating to Korean War veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Myron Dossett [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] | Rep. Jeff Greer [D] | Rep. Tim Moore [R] |
Rep. Sal Santoro [R] | Rep. Jill York [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 32) |
2014-03-26 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2014-03-26 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2014-03-26 | House | received in House |
2014-03-25 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-20 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-03-07 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2014-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 4, 2014 |
2014-02-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-26 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-01-24 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-23 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB234.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB234/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB234/vote_history.pdf |