KY HB20 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 022)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 022)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 132.485 to clarify the standards for appraising the value of motor vehicles that are 20 years old or older for property tax purposes, by providing that no vehicle of said age shall be presumed to have been maintained or restored to either the original factory condition or any otherwise classic condition, and also by establishing the standard value of said vehicles; provide that the Act shall apply to motor vehicles assessed on or after January 1, 2016.
Title
AN ACT relating to the valuation of motor vehicles for property tax purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 022) |
2015-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-11 | House | Bill passed 95-0 |
2015-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2015-03-11 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2015-03-11 | House | to Rules (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | received in House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute |
2015-03-10 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-19 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0-1 |
2015-02-11 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 13, 2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-06 | House | posted in committee |
2015-01-06 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2015-01-06 | House | introduced in House |
2015-11-12 | House | To: Interim Joint Committee on Transportation |