KY HB172 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 52)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 158.836 to make provisions for students with life-threatening allergies to have access to an epinephrine auto-injector in school; require schools to have written emergency anaphylactic reaction response plan; require schools to keep an epinephrine auto-injector in a minimum of 2 locations in the school; exempt authorized person from civil liability for administering or assisting with the administration of epinephrine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to emergency anaphylaxis medications in schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-21Housesigned by Governor (Acts Chapter 52)
2013-03-12Housedelivered to Governor
2013-03-12Houseenrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2013-03-12Housepassed 100-0
2013-03-12HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute
2013-03-12Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute
2013-03-12Housetaken from Rules
2013-03-12Houseto Rules (H)
2013-03-12Housereceived in House
2013-03-07Senate3rd reading, passed 37-1 with Committee Substitute
2013-03-07Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013
2013-03-07Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill
2013-03-06Senatereturned to Education (S)
2013-03-06Senate2nd reading
2013-03-06Senatetaken from Education (S)
2013-03-05Senatereturned to Education (S)
2013-03-05Senate1st reading
2013-03-05Senatetaken from Education (S)
2013-03-05Senateto Education (S)
2013-03-04Senatereceived in Senate
2013-03-01House3rd reading, passed 91-2 with Committee Substitute
2013-02-27Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2013
2013-02-26Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill
2013-02-25Houseposting waived
2013-02-25Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2013-02-25Housetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day
2013-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2013
2013-02-22House2nd reading, to Rules
2013-02-21Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2013-02-20Houseposting waived
2013-02-20Houseposted in committee
2013-02-06Houseto Education (H)
2013-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback