KY HB133 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 27)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 27)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create KRS Chapter 190A, regarding recreational vehicle dealer relationships with manufacturers; define "area of sales responsibility," "dealer agreement," "established place of business," "family member," "new recreational vehicle dealer,"" factory campaign,"" line-make," "manufacturer," "proprietary part," "recreational vehicle," "recreational vehicle salesperson," "supplier," " transient customer" and "warrantor"; establish guidelines for new recreational vehicle dealers, manufacturers and distributors; set forth requirements for recreational vehicle dealer agreements; establish a warrantor's obligations to a recreational vehicle dealer; prescribe procedures for the termination or nonrenewal of an recreational vehicle dealer agreement; prohibits specified actions by a warrantor or dealer; establish procedures a dealer and manufacturer must follow if dealer receives a damaged recreational vehicle; prohibit coercive actions by a manufacturer; amend KRS 190.010 to define "recreational vehicle" and "new recreational vehicle dealer"; amend KRS 190.030 to establish fee schedule and establish a new recreational dealer license and recreational vehicle salesperson license; amend KRS 190.033 to require an applicant or holder of a new recreational vehicle dealer's license to have on file with the Motor Vehicle Commission an approved indemnifying bond or insurance policy; amend KRS 190.035 to require new recreational vehicle dealers to have an established place of business to obtain a license; amend KRS 190.040 to establish when a recreational vehicle license may be denied, suspended, or revoked; amend KRS 190.062 to require the parties to a dispute involving recreational vehicle franchise issues to attempt mediation before bringing a civil action; amend KRS 190.090 to include recreational vehicles in the installment sales contract provisions; amend KRS 190.260, 190.270 and 190.300 to include motor homes in the odometer provisions; provide that the Act may be cited as the "Recreational Vehicle Dealer Franchise Act of 2014."
Title
AN ACT relating to recreational vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Gooch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 27) |
2014-03-26 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2014-03-26 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2014-03-26 | House | received in House |
2014-03-25 | Senate | passed 34-2 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | floor amendment (1) defeated |
2014-03-25 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2014-03-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2014-03-20 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-19 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-02-26 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-02-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-1 with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 14, 2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-01-30 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-08 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2014-01-07 | House | introduced in House |