KY HB109 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 508.130 and create a new section of KRS Chapter 508 to establish the offense of criminal GPS tracking as a Class A misdemeanor.
Title
AN ACT relating to criminal GPS tracking.
Sponsors
Rep. John Tilley [D] | Rep. Chris Harris [D] | Rep. Cluster Howard [D] | Rep. Martha King [D] |
Rep. Jody Richards [D] | Rep. Dean Schamore [D] | Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with committee amendment (1) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-26 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill |
2015-02-24 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | 1st reading |
2015-02-24 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2015-02-13 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-03 | House | posting waived |
2015-01-06 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2015-01-06 | House | introduced in House |