KS SB356 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Claims against the state; 2013 joint committee recommendations.
Title
Claims against the state; 2013 joint committee recommendations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 06, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 5, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 548-S Canceled |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 05, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/sb356/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/sb356_00_0000.pdf |