KS SB307 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-02-03 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 06, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 548-S
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Kansas electric transmission authority; composition of authority and advisory council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kansas electric transmission authority; composition of authority and advisory council.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-03SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 06, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 548-S
2014-02-03SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 04, 2014, 1:30 p.m. Room 548-S CANCELED
2014-01-30SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 04, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 548-S
2014-01-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Utilities
2014-01-27SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback