KS SB271 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Kansas medicaid fraud control act.
Title
Amending the Kansas medicaid fraud control act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 11, 2014 |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2014-04-04 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2014-04-05 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2014-04-01 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kinzer, Representative Bruchman and Representative Pauls appointed as conferees |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator King , Senator Smith and Senator Haley as conferees |
2014-03-26 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-03-05 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 12, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2014-02-20 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-20 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 29, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 346 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 28, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Senate Introduced |