KS HB2681 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2681 by Committee on Veterans, Military, and Homeland Security - Abolishing the Kansas commission on veterans affairs; creating the Kansas commission on veterans affairs office within the executive branch of government.
Title
Substitute for HB 2681 by Committee on Veterans, Military, and Homeland Security - Abolishing the Kansas commission on veterans affairs; creating the Kansas commission on veterans affairs office within the executive branch of government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-04 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014 |
2014-04-30 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 14, 2014 |
2014-04-04 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 24, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2014-03-20 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Trimmer was rejected |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Trimmer |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2014-03-07 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2014-03-06 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Rereferred to Committee on Veterans, Military and Homeland Security |
2014-02-27 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2014-02-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2014-02-19 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 20, 2014, 9:00 AM Room 152-S |
2014-02-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Veterans, Military and Homeland Security |
2014-02-13 | House | House Introduced |