KS HB2578 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 22 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 22 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating the possession of weapons.
Title
Regulating the possession of weapons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 102 Nay: 19 (Y: 102 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 2 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 2 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 22 April 2014 |
2014-04-30 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 14, 2014 |
2014-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 102 Nay: 19 |
2014-04-05 | House | House Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed |
2014-04-05 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 2 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2014-04-02 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Brunk, Representative Couture-Lovelady and Representative Ruiz appointed as second conferees |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Ostmeyer, Senator Shultz and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Ostmeyer, Senator Shultz and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees |
2014-04-01 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Brunk , Representative Couture-Lovelady and Representative Ruiz as conferees |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was withdrawn |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 19, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2014-03-17 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2014-03-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2014-03-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-02-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 19, 2014, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2014-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2014-02-07 | House | House Introduced |