KS HB2453 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting religious freedom regarding marriage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting religious freedom regarding marriage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-12 - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 72 Nay: 49 (Y: 72 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-30SenateSenate Died in Senate Committee
2014-02-13SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2014-02-13HouseHouse Engrossed on Wednesday, 12 February 2014
2014-02-12SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2014-02-12HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 72 Nay: 49
2014-02-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2014-02-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hill was rejected
2014-02-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hill
2014-02-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hill was rejected
2014-02-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hill
2014-02-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion by Representative Concannon to rerefer to Committee on Federal and State Affairs failed
2014-02-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2014-02-07HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
2014-01-22HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, January 28, 2014, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2014-01-17HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, January 23, 2014, 9:00 AM Room 346-S-CANCELLED
2014-01-16HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2014-01-16HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback