KS HB2338 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-30 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Substitute for HB 2338 by Committee on Ways and Means - Judicial branch; supplemental appropriation for fiscal year 2015, judiciary operations; increasing various docket fees and creating new docket fees; annually, allowing the allocation of a budget for each judicial district court operations, chief judge would have the authority to expend funds as necessary to carry out the functions of such district if such chief judge elected to do so, including establishing what court personnel are necessary and their compensation; district court judges in judicial district elect chief judge and court of appeals judges elect chief judge of the court of appeals; district judge and district magistrate judge vacancies; statutory authority for longevity bonus for judicial branch employees repealed; nonseverability clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Substitute for HB 2338 by Committee on Ways and Means - Judicial branch; supplemental appropriation for fiscal year 2015, judiciary operations; increasing various docket fees and creating new docket fees; annually, allowing the allocation of a budget for each judicial district court operations, chief judge would have the authority to expend funds as necessary to carry out the functions of such district if such chief judge elected to do so, including establishing what court personnel are necessary and their compensation; district court judges in judicial district elect chief judge and court of appeals judges elect chief judge of the court of appeals; district judge and district magistrate judge vacancies; statutory authority for longevity bonus for judicial branch employees repealed; nonseverability clause.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-04 - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 66 Nay: 57 (Y: 66 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 26 Nay: 11 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 23 Nay: 12 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hensley was rejected - Yea: 10 Nay: 27 (Y: 10 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-26 - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 67 Nay: 52 (Y: 67 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-30HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 April 2014
2014-04-30HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 11, 2014
2014-04-04HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 66 Nay: 57
2014-04-02SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 26 Nay: 11
2014-04-02SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2014-03-25HouseHouse Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Rhoades, Representative Kinzer and Representative Henry appointed as second conferees
2014-03-25SenateSenate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Masterson, Senator King and Senator Francisco appointed as conferees
2014-03-17SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Masterson, Senator King and Senator Francisco appointed as conferees
2014-03-12HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Rhoades , Representative Kinzer and Representative Henry as conferees
2014-03-06SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 23 Nay: 12
2014-03-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hensley was rejected Yea: 10 Nay: 27
2014-03-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hensley
2014-03-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected
2014-03-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley
2014-03-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator King was adopted
2014-03-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator King
2014-03-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2014-02-28SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means
2013-03-27SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2013-03-26SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2013-03-26HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 67 Nay: 52
2013-03-25HouseHouse Engrossed on Monday, 25 March 2013
2013-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2013-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2013-03-18HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
2013-02-25HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 27, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 112-N
2013-02-13HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2013-02-13HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/hb2338/
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/hb2338_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/hb2338_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/hb2338_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/hb2338_03_0000.pdf
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/hb2338_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/odt_view/je_20130326100026_952352/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/odt_view/je_20140306173325_352862/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/odt_view/je_20140306175859_441510/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/odt_view/je_20140402155125_919852/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/odt_view/je_20140404191823_894300/

Bill Comments

feedback