KS HB2252 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-04-01 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, 01 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminating the statute of limitations for prosecutions of rape and aggravated criminal sodomy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminating the statute of limitations for prosecutions of rape and aggravated criminal sodomy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-14 - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-01HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Monday, 01 April 2013
2013-03-22HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 22, 2013
2013-03-14SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2013-03-13SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2013-03-07SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2013-03-07SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2013-03-01SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2013-03-01HouseHouse Engrossed on Friday, 01 March 2013
2013-03-01HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
2013-02-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2013-02-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2013-02-26HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2013-02-13HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 152-S
2013-02-07HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2013-02-06HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback