KS HB2219 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an itemized deduction for certain wagering losses for individual income tax purposes.
Title
Allowing an itemized deduction for certain wagering losses for individual income tax purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2024-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2023-01-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2023-01-30 | House | House Introduced |