KS HB2170 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 11 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 11 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sentencing dispositions, probation and postrelease supervision.
Title
Concerning sentencing dispositions, probation and postrelease supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 75 Nay: 44 (Y: 75 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 4 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 79 Nay: 44 (Y: 79 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 4 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 79 Nay: 44 (Y: 79 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, 11 April 2013 |
2013-04-05 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 05, 2013 |
2013-04-02 | House | House Reengrossed on Monday, 01 April 2013 |
2013-03-27 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 75 Nay: 44 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 4 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2013, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-03-01 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, 01 March 2013 |
2013-03-01 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 79 Nay: 44 |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kinzer was adopted |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Kinzer |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 11, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2013-01-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2013-01-30 | House | House Introduced |