KS HB2033 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 16 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 16 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the regulation of knives.
Title
Concerning the regulation of knives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 95 Nay: 26 (Y: 95 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 93 Nay: 28 (Y: 93 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 93 Nay: 28 (Y: 93 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 16 April 2013 |
2013-05-08 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-04 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 95 Nay: 26 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate Senator Hawk replaces Senator Holland on the Conference Committee |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Senator Holland replaces Senator Haley on the Conference Committee |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Senator Emler replaces Senator Smith on the Conference Committee |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Senator Ostmeyer replaces Senator King on the Conference Committee |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator King, Senator Smith and Senator Haley appointed as conferees |
2013-03-27 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Siegfreid , Representative Brunk and Representative Ruiz as conferees |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hawk was adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hawk |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Motion to Reconsider Adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Masterson was adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Masterson |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2013, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-03-07 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 93 Nay: 28 |
2013-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-01-30 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 06, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2013-01-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2013-01-18 | House | House Introduced |