KS HB2014 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - House Motion by Rep. Jennings to reconsider failed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - House Motion by Rep. Jennings to reconsider failed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2014 by Committee on Utilities - Repealing the renewable energy act.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2014 by Committee on Utilities - Repealing the renewable energy act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Motion to concur with amendments failed - Yea: 44 Nay: 77 (Y: 44 N: 77 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - House Motion to nonconcur with amendments and appoint conferees failed - Yea: 51 Nay: 71 (Y: 51 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 25 Nay: 15 (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted - Yea: 30 Nay: 10 (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House Motion to nonconcur with amendments and appoint conferees failed - Yea: 51 Nay: 71 (Y: 51 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 25 Nay: 15 (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted - Yea: 30 Nay: 10 (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | House Motion by Rep. Jennings to reconsider failed. |
2014-03-26 | House | House Motion to concur with amendments failed; Yea: 44 Nay: 77 |
2014-03-26 | House | House Motion to nonconcur with amendments and appoint conferees failed; Yea: 51 Nay: 71 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 25 Nay: 15 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hawk was rejected |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hawk |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted Yea: 30 Nay: 10 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Interstate Cooperation; Referred to Committee on Utilities |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Referred to Committee on Interstate Cooperation |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2013, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-02-25 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 0 |
2013-02-22 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, 20 February 2013 |
2013-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-01-23 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 31, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2013-01-16 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-16 | House | House Introduced |