IN SR0054 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Second reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Second reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting the continued shift towards reliable, secure sources of Canadian oil.
Title
Supporting the continued shift towards reliable, secure sources of Canadian oil.
Sponsors
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] | Sen. Beverly Gard [R] |
Sen. Karen Tallian [D] | Sen. Brent Waltz [R] | Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Second reading: adopted voice vote | |
2011-04-05 | Senators Delph, Waltz and Buck added as coauthors | |
2011-04-05 | Senator Charbonneau added as third author | |
2011-04-04 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Senator Gard added as coauthor | |
2011-03-21 | First reading: referred to Committee on Energy and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-21 | Authored by Senators Yoder and Tallian |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SR&docno=0054 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SRESF/SR0054.html |