IN SCR0007 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-03-09 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Study on involuntary commitment/substance use disorders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Study on involuntary commitment/substance use disorders.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Returned to the Senate
2012-03-09 First reading: adopted voice vote
2012-03-07 Cosponsor: Rep. Noe
2012-03-07 House sponsor: Rep. Welch
2012-03-07 Referred to the House
2012-03-07 Second reading: adopted voice vote
2012-03-06 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-01-10 First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2012-01-10 Authored by Senator Simpson

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback