IN SB0529 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Public Law 193
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Public Law 193
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agricultural matters. Provides that a county, city, town, or township may not adopt or continue in effect any ordinance, rule, regulation, or resolution prohibiting the establishment or maintenance of beekeeping on property that the person owns, rents, or leases. Specifies that a county, city, town, or township may adopt an ordinance, rule, regulation, or resolution that regulates certain aspects of beekeeping.
Title
Agricultural matters. Provides that a county, city, town, or township may not adopt or continue in effect any ordinance, rule, regulation, or resolution prohibiting the establishment or maintenance of beekeeping on property that the person owns, rents, or leases. Specifies that a county, city, town, or township may adopt an ordinance, rule, regulation, or resolution that regulates certain aspects of beekeeping.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Chris Garten [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] |
Rep. Donald Lehe [R] | Rep. Terry Goodin [D] | Rep. Steven Davisson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Floor - (Y: 50 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Floor - (Y: 50 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Public Law 193 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-24 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 628: yeas 78, nays 16 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 592: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-04-23 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Crider and Taylor G |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Grooms and Lanane |
2019-04-17 | House | House advisors appointed: Lehe, Prescott, Goodin and Wright |
2019-04-17 | House | House conferees appointed: Clere and Deal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2019-04-12 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2019-04-11 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 486: yeas 85, nays 6 |
2019-04-10 | House | Amendment #1 (Deal) prevailed; Roll Call 470: yeas 50, nays 42 |
2019-04-10 | House | Amendment #4 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-04-10 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Lehe, Goodin and Davisson |
2019-02-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Clere |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 198: yeas 44, nays 5 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senator Garten added as third author |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second author |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Grooms |