IN SB0432 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Self-storage insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Self-storage insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 81
2013-04-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-17HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-08SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-04SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2013-04-04SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 383: yeas 48, nays 0
2013-04-03SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-03-19HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-03-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 300: yeas 96, nays 0
2013-03-18HouseRepresentative Hale added as cosponsor
2013-03-18HouseAmendment 1 (Heaton), prevailed; voice vote
2013-03-18HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-03-14HouseRepresentative Mahan added as cosponsor
2013-03-14HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2013-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Heaton
2013-02-26SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 231: yeas 50 and nays 0
2013-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-02-21SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-10SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2013-01-10SenateAuthored by Senator Paul

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback