IN SB0421 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-03-25 - Public Law 112
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows a county fiscal body to waive certification requirements for certain members of the property tax assessment board of appeals appointed by the fiscal body. Establishes assessor, appraiser, and tax representative standards of conduct. Removes a provision specifying that a crematory authority may deliver cremated remains to a funeral director in person or by registered mail. Replaces the regulated occupations evaluation committee with the jobs creation committee. Provides that the funds from certain professions may be used by that profession's board to pay for the administrative expenses of the profession. Makes a change to the definition of "attest" to concur with the Uniform Accountancy Act. Allows a member of the Indiana board of accountancy (board) to serve three terms. Creates a status of "retired" for certified public accountants. Increases the cap on the accountant investigative fund (fund) to $1,000,000 and directs fines that can currently be imposed by the board to the fund. Removes the requirements that a home inspector's, massage therapist's, private investigator firm's, or security guard agency's insurance list the state as an additional insured. Delays the expiration of certain provisions concerning a certified direct entry midwife and penalties concerning the practice of midwifery. Requires a nonresident pharmacy to submit an inspection report from the applicant's home state. Allows a graduate from a foreign college of veterinary medicine who has a Program for the Assessment of Veterinary Medical Education Equivalence certificate to meet the qualification of graduating from an accredited college of veterinary medicine for purposes of certain licensure exemptions and for applying for a veterinary license. Provides that the state board of funeral and

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional licensing matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-12 - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House Floor - (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions - Roll Call 042104 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate Committee on Commerce, Economic Development & Technology - Roll Call 042101 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-25SenatePublic Law 112
2014-03-25SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-14SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-14HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-12HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 461: yeas 96 and nays 0
2014-03-12SenateConference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 396: yeas 45 and nays 0
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative Forestal added as advisor
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative Wolkins added as advisor
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative Rhoads added as advisor
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative Moseley added as conferee
2014-03-10HouseRepresentative McMillin added as conferee
2014-03-06SenateSenator Mrvan added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Kruse added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Taylor added as conferee
2014-03-06SenateSenator Head added as conferee
2014-03-06SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2014-03-03HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2014-03-03HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 380: yeas 96 and nays 0
2014-02-27HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
2014-02-27HouseSB 421 Amendment #2 (Thompson), prevailed.
2014-02-27HouseSB 421 Amendment #1 (Lehe), prevailed.
2014-02-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-11HouseRepresentative Rhoads added as cosponsor.
2014-02-11HouseRepresentative McMillin added as sponsor.
2014-02-11HouseRepresentative Rhoads removed as sponsor.
2014-02-10HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Employment, Labor and Pensions
2014-02-03SenateRepresentative Rhoads added as sponsor.
2014-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2014-02-03SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 132: yeas 48 and nays 0
2014-01-30SenateSenator Kruse added as second author.
2014-01-30SenateReread second time; amended, ordered engrossed
2014-01-30SenateSB 421 Amendment #4 (Merritt), prevailed.
2014-01-30SenateSB 421 Amendment #5 (Miller, Pat), prevailed.
2014-01-28SenateReturned to second reading
2014-01-28SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-01-28SenateSB 421 Amendment #1 (Head), prevailed.
2014-01-24SenateCommittee report: do pass amend, adopted.
2014-01-14SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Commerce, Economic Development & Technology
2014-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Head.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/421/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/1/d/d71d881c/SB0421.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/d/f/7ddfcb47/SB0421.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/2/3/1f236d36/SB0421.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/d/7/6cd7046e/SB0421.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/2/a/d92a4e02/SB0421.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/e/a/29ea6031/SB0421.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/6/7/e6674cc4/SB0421.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/e/1/71e1c649/SB0421.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/8/4/9/a84905c0/SB0421.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/1/e/2c1e08d5/SB0421.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/c/a/e5ca6cd7/SB0421.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/d/8/ccd820bf/SB0421.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/b/6/81b66103/SB0421.07.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/6/b/236ba705/SB0421.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/9/6/f59671f7/SB0421.04.ENGS.132.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/9/c/4b9c0abb/SB0421.04.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/4/5/ac45670e/SB0421.06.ENGH.380.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/2/f/542f6547/SB0421.06.ENGH.396.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/e/7/dee78f2c/SB0421.06.ENGH.461.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback