IN SB0305 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Makes compounds currently classified as synthetic drugs schedule I controlled substances. Makes conforming amendments and repeals obsolete provisions.
Title
Schedule I drugs and "spice".
Sponsors
Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 030501 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 030501 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Representative M. Smith added as sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 80: yeas 48 and nays 1 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senator Steele added as third author. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senator Alting added as second author. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Merritt. |