IN SB0245 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows a health care provider with prescriptive authority to prescribe auto-injectable epinephrine to a school or school district. Sets requirements for certain individuals employed by a school or school district to fill, store, and administer auto-injectable epinephrine. Provides civil immunity for: (1) certain school employees in the administration of auto-injectable epinephrine; and (2) health care providers in the prescribing of auto-injectable epinephrine and in the training of school employees in the administration of auto-injectable epinephrine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools and auto-injectable epinephrine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-24 - House Floor - (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 024503 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 024501 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-25SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-03-25SenatePublic Law 92
2014-03-10SenateSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-05SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-02-24HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2014-02-24HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 253: yeas 96 and nays 0
2014-02-20HouseSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-18HouseRepresentative Lucas added as cosponsor.
2014-02-18HouseRepresentative Battles added as cosponsor.
2014-02-18HouseRepresentative Ober added as cosponsor.
2014-02-18HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-10HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Education
2014-01-28SenateRepresentative Zent added as sponsor.
2014-01-28SenateReferred to the House
2014-01-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 72: yeas 49 and nays 0
2014-01-27SenateReread second time: amended and ordered engrossed
2014-01-27SenateSB 245 Amendment #2 (Miller, Pat), prevailed.
2014-01-23SenateReturned to second reading
2014-01-23SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor.
2014-01-23SenateSenator Breaux added as coauthor.
2014-01-21SenateSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-01-14SenateSenator R. Young added as coauthor.
2014-01-09SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services
2014-01-09SenateAuthored by Senator Pat Miller, Becker

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/245/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/8/e/dc8e4c9c/SB0245.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/1/f/eb1f9b02/SB0245.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/0/d/2f0d77b5/SB0245.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/f/3/00f342f9/SB0245.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/a/e/25ae2038/SB0245.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/e/f/f1ef355f/SB0245.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/8/6/ae86b11b/SB0245.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/c/9/efc91c6e/SB0245.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/8/9/a789e9aa/SB0245.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/f/8/48f8b3f1/SB0245.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/f/2/9bf27ed9/SB0245.03.ENGS.72.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/7/7/c377ba38/SB0245.03.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/8/4/bf84b57e/SB0245.04.COMH.253.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback