IN SB0229 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-03-26 - Public Law 157
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows a firearm that may be destroyed to be sold to a salvage company and destroyed by dismantling the firearm for parts, scrap metal, or recycling, or for resale as parts for other firearms. Provides that a unit may conduct a firearms buyback program with private funds or grants. Establishes a procedure to permit certain individuals whose firearms have been retained by a law enforcement agency to have the firearms sold at auction and the proceeds, less the costs of sale, returned to the individual. Removes a provision from the law making possession of a firearm on property that is being used by a school for a school function a felony. Provides, for purposes of the law concerning possession of firearms on school property, that the law does not apply to certain students who are members of a shooting sports team or certain individuals who may legally possess a firearm and possess a firearm that is locked in the trunk of the person's motor vehicle, kept in the glove compartment of the person's locked motor vehicle, or stored out of plain sight in the person's locked motor vehicle. Specifies that the law concerning firearms in locked vehicles does not prohibit an employer from prohibiting an employee from possessing a firearm or ammunition at the employer's residence. Provides that the chapter concerning possession of firearms on school property and school buses does not apply to a person who may possess the firearm and possesses the firearm in a motor vehicle. Makes it a Class A misdemeanor if certain persons leave a firearm in plain view in a motor vehicle parked in a school parking lot. Removes a provision from the law concerning firearms in locked vehicles that allows a person to adopt or enforce an ordinance, a resolution, a policy or rule that prohibits an employee of the

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearm matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House Floor - (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House Floor - (Y: 24 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House Committee on Public Policy - Roll Call 022902 (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 022901 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-26SenatePublic Law 157
2014-03-26SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-03-20SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-14HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-13HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 519: yeas 75 and nays 24
2014-03-13SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 445: yeas 38 and nays 10
2014-03-13HouseRepresentative Mayfield added as conferee
2014-03-13HouseRepresentative Lawson removed as conferee
2014-03-13SenateSenator Hershman added as conferee
2014-03-13SenateSenator Hershman removed as advisor
2014-03-13SenateSenator Broden removed as conferee
2014-03-10SenateSenator R. Young added as advisor
2014-03-10SenateSenator Broden added as conferee
2014-03-10SenateSenator R. Young removed as conferee
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Dvorak added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Austin added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Torr added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Morrison added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Dermody added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Lucas added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative McMillin added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Lawson added as conferee
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Eberhart added as conferee
2014-03-05SenateSenator Steele added as advisor
2014-03-05SenateSenator Hume added as advisor
2014-03-05SenateSenator Hershman added as advisor
2014-03-05SenateSenator R. Young added as conferee
2014-03-05SenateSenator Tomes added as conferee
2014-03-05SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2014-03-03HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2014-03-03HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 376: yeas 74 and nays 24
2014-02-27HouseRepresentative Speedy added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27HouseSB 229 Amendment #1 (Lawson), failed.
2014-02-27HouseSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-17HouseRepresentative Dermody added as cosponsor.
2014-02-11HouseRepresentative Lucas added as cosponsor.
2014-02-04HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Public Policy
2014-01-28SenateRepresentative Eberhart added as sponsor.
2014-01-28SenateReferred to the House
2014-01-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 70: yeas 28 and nays 21
2014-01-27SenateSenator Arnold added as coauthor.
2014-01-27SenateSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-24SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor.
2014-01-24SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor.
2014-01-24SenateSenator Banks added as coauthor.
2014-01-24SenateSenator Paul added as coauthor.
2014-01-24SenateSenator Leising added as coauthor.
2014-01-24SenateSenator Young R Michael added as coauthor.
2014-01-24SenateSenator Hershman added as coauthor.
2014-01-24SenateSenator Smith added as coauthor.
2014-01-24SenateSenator Waterman added as coauthor.
2014-01-24SenateSenator Waltz added as coauthor.
2014-01-24SenateSenator Nugent added as third author.
2014-01-23SenateCommittee report; do pass; adopted
2014-01-15SenateSenator Steele added as second author.
2014-01-09SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Judiciary
2014-01-09SenateAuthored by Senator Tomes.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/229/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/a/7/dba7cd5d/SB0229.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/0/3/54030bd1/SB0229.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/9/e/f09e2272/SB0229.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/9/3/0d939743/SB0229.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/2/f/dc2f8b89/SB0229.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/f/8/d5f842fe/SB0229.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/6/6/66663bcd/SB0229.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/1/3/1f1316bb/SB0229.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/7/6/5d76fbc3/SB0229.02.COMS.70.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/0/8/9808fa92/SB0229.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/a/2/96a20179/SB0229.03.COMH.322.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/3/3/6833847b/SB0229.03.COMH.376.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/b/d/45bd565d/SB0229.03.COMH.519.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/0/8/cb08f0ee/SB0229.03.COMH.445.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback