IN SB0173 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Representative Bauer added as advisor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Representative Bauer added as advisor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Beginning January 1, 2015, changes asset limitations within the community and home options to institutional care for the elderly and disabled program (program) from $500,000 to $250,000 and specifies certain exemptions. Beginning January 1, 2015, requires annual adjustment of the asset limitation using the federal Consumer Price Index. Beginning January 1, 2015, allows a participant who is unable to perform at least one activity to participate in the program under specified circumstances. Requires the division of aging (division) and the area agencies on aging to jointly establish specified procedures. Beginning January 1, 2015, allows the division to: (1) annually redetermine program eligibility; and (2) place a lien to recoup the cost of program services that exceed $20,000. Requires the division to exclude $20,000 of countable assets in determining cost participation for the program. Defines "under development" for purposes of the moratorium on nursing facility comprehensive care beds. Prohibits the state department of health from approving the licensure of comprehensive care health facilities or new or converted comprehensive care beds. Prohibits residential nursing care facility beds from being converted to comprehensive care beds. Adds exemptions for: (1) health facilities under development as of June 30, 2014; (2) certain replacement facilities; and (3) continuing care retirement communities. Specifies that the state department of health makes the final determination concerning whether an entity is under development. Postpones the expiration of the moratorium from June 30, 2014, to June 30, 2015.
Title
CHOICE program; nursing facility moratorium.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Miller [R] | Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Timothy Skinner [D] | Sen. James Merritt [R] |
Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Gail Riecken [D] | Rep. Charlie Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 017304 (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 017301 (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 017304 (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 017301 (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Bauer added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Macer added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Baird added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Huston added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative C. Brown added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Clere added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Leising added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator R. Young added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Pat Miller added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2014-03-03 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-03-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 374: yeas 55 and nays 40 |
2014-02-27 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-27 | House | SB 173 Amendment #13 (Clere), prevailed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2014-02-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-13 | House | Representative C. Brown added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-13 | House | Representative Riecken added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-13 | House | Representative Clere added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-11 | House | First Reading: Referred to Public Health |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Representative T. Brown added as sponsor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 31: yeas 33 and nays 14 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Miller, Pat), prevailed. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senator Leising added as second author. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senator Skinner added as third author. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senator Merritt, Mishler added as coauthors. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Miller, Patricia |