IN SB0001 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 172
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

School resource officers and school safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School resource officers and school safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-26 - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 172
2013-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-05-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-26HouseConference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 644: yeas 93, nays 6
2013-04-26HouseRules suspended
2013-04-26SenateConference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 569: yeas 45, nays 5
2013-04-17HouseHouse advisors appointed: Turner, Lucas, VanDenburgh, Candelaria Reardon and Goodin
2013-04-17HouseHouse conferees appointed: Torr and Lawson
2013-04-17SenateSenator Steele added as advisor
2013-04-16SenateSenate advisors appointed: Pete Miller, Hume, Kenley and M. Young
2013-04-16SenateSenate conferee appointed: Charbonneau and Arnold
2013-04-16SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2013-04-15HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-04-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 477: yeas 86, nays 6
2013-04-11HouseAmendment 31 (McMillin), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-11HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-04-09HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-04-04HouseRepresentatives Burton, Clere, Eberhart, Frizzell, Gutwein, Hamm, Lucas and Morrison added as cosponsors
2013-04-04HouseHouse Rule 105.1 suspended
2013-04-02HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2013-04-02HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2013-02-25SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2013-02-25SenateCosponsors: Reps. Steuerwald, Lawson and Behning
2013-02-25SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Torr
2013-02-25SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 179: yeas 43 and nays 7
2013-02-21SenateAmendment 1 (Pete Miller), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-21SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-02-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-14SenateSenators Hume, Pat Miller and Landske added as coauthors
2013-01-22SenateSenators Nugent and Wyss added as coauthors
2013-01-22SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second author
2013-01-17SenateSenator Arnold added as third author
2013-01-10SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2013-01-10SenateAuthored by Senator Pete Miller

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2013&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0001
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/IN/IN0001.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SB/SB0001.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SB/SB0001.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/ES/ES0001.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/ES/ES0001.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/ES/ES0001.3.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SE/SE0001.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0179.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0477.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0569.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0644.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback