IN HB1155 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Public Law 181
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Public Law 181
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relocates and restates certain provisions dealing with the expungement of arrest records, and deletes inconsistent language. (Under current law, there are two inconsistent procedures for expunging arrest records.) Specifies where a petition for expungement must be filed, and removes the prohibition against a waiver or reduction of the filing fee for an indigent person. Grants a defense attorney and a probation department access to expunged records if authorized by court order. Allows a court to accept filing of a subsequent petition for expungement that includes convictions not named in the original petition under certain circumstances. Provides that a court must find by a preponderance of the evidence instead of by clear and convincing evidence that all the requirements of expungement have been met to order a person's conviction records marked as expunged. Prohibits a person from waiving the right to expungement as part of a plea agreement. Grants access to expunged records to: (1) the supreme court and the state board of law examiners to determine a person's fitness for admission to the bar; and (2) a person required to access expunged records to comply with the federal Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act. Specifies the procedure to be used to regain the right to possess a firearm by a person convicted of a misdemeanor crime of domestic violence. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the criminal law and sentencing policy study committee.)
Title
Expungement.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Turner [R] | Rep. Judson McMillin [R] | Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] | Rep. Gregory Porter [D] |
Sen. Greg Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 115502 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 115502 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 115501 (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 115502 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 115502 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 115501 (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Public Law 181 |
2014-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-06 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 427: yeas 74 and nays 19 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 302: yeas 42 and nays 6 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator M. Young added second sponsor. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1155 Amendment #1 (Steele), prevailed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-23 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 48: yeas 80 and nays 15 |
2014-01-23 | House | Senator Steele added as sponsor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code |
2014-01-13 | House | Coauthored by Representatives McMillin, Shackleford, Porter |
2014-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Turner. |