IN HB1009 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-27 - First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
Pending: Senate Pensions and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-27 - First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
Pending: Senate Pensions and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployment compensation.
Title
Unemployment compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2013-02-25 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Boots |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 243: yeas 72, nays 22 |
2013-02-21 | House | Amendment 1 (Austin), ruled out of order |
2013-02-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-21 | House | Representative Morris added as coauthor |
2013-02-19 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2013-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Torr |