IN HB1005 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 268
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-26 - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the House (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - Amendment 6 (VanDenburgh), failed (Y: 32 N: 66 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 268
2013-05-11HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-05-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-05-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-27SenateJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
2013-04-27HouseRepresentative Heuer added as coauthor
2013-04-26HouseConference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 653: yeas 79, nays 20
2013-04-26HouseRules suspended
2013-04-26HouseJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
2013-04-26SenateConference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 574: yeas 49, nays 1
2013-04-26HouseConference committee report 2 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 635: yeas 81, nays 14
2013-04-26HouseRules suspended
2013-04-15SenateSenate advisors appointed: Kruse, Taylor and Pete Miller
2013-04-15SenateSenate conferee appointed: Yoder and Rogers
2013-04-11HouseHouse advisors appointed: Behning, McNamara, VanDenburgh and Battles
2013-04-11HouseHouse conferees appointed: Clere and V. Smith
2013-04-11HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2013-04-08SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2013-04-08SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 395: yeas 49 and nays 0
2013-04-04SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2013-04-04SenateAmendment 1 (Waltz), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-04SenateAmendment 2 (Yoder), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-04SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-03-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2013-02-25SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2013-02-07HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Yoder and Rogers
2013-02-07HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-02-07HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 86: yeas 86, nays 13
2013-02-05HouseAmendment 1 (V. Smith), failed; voice vote
2013-02-05HouseAmendment 6 (VanDenburgh), failed; Roll Call 65: yeas 32, nays 66
2013-02-05HouseAmendment 8 (Clere), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-05HouseAmendment 7 (Clere), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-05HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-22HouseRepresentative Behning added as coauthor
2013-01-15HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2013-01-15HouseCoauthored by Representative McNamara
2013-01-15HouseAuthored by Representative Clere

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2013&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=HB&docno=1005
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/IN/IN1005.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HB/HB1005.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HB/HB1005.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/EH/EH1005.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/EH/EH1005.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/EH/EH1005.3.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HE/HE1005.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0065.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0086.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0395.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0574.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0635.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0653.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback