IL SR1683 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-04 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-04 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates December 23, 2014 as Scott's Law Day in the State of Illinois and encourages people to remember Scott's Law and to move their vehicle over when they see emergency vehicles.
Title
SCOTT'S LAW DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions December 3, 2014 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1683&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SR/09800SR1683.htm |