IL SR1002 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Declares an interest in strengthening the infrastructure of volunteerism in the State, instructs that a Senate Forum be held on volunteerism, and designates 2015 as a Year of Service and Engagement.
Title
VOLUNTEERISM IN ILLINOIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Resolution Adopted as Amended |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 6, 2014 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Be Adopted as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |