IL SB3823 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1047
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1047
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code and the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Provides that the Secretary of State shall suspend, pursuant to court order, the driver's license of a person adjudicated by a court to have engaged in visitation abuse. Provides procedures for that suspension process. Provides that the court, upon finding that a party engaged in visitation abuse, may order: the suspension of the offending party's Illinois driving privileges pursuant to the Illinois Vehicle Code, until the court has determined that there has been sufficient compliance with the court's visitation order and that full driving privileges shall be reinstated; the issuance of a family responsibility driving permit to the offending party to allow limited driving privileges for employment, for medical purposes, and to transport a child pursuant to a visitation order; the placement of the offending party on probation; or the sentencing of the offending party to periodic imprisonment for up to 6 months, provided that the court may allow periods of release for work. Effective immediately.
Title
DISSOLUTION-VISITATION ABUSE
Sponsors
Sen. John Sullivan [D] | Rep. Constance Howard [D] | Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] | Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] |
Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-21 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1047 |
2012-08-21 | Senate | Effective Date August 21, 2012 |
2012-08-21 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-26 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2012-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2012-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-002 |
2012-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2012-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2012-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2012-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2012-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 009-000-000 |
2012-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Constance A. Howard |
2012-04-19 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2012-04-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-04-18 | House | First Reading |
2012-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-04-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard |
2012-03-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2012 |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2012 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 7-701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 7-702 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 7-702.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 7-703 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 7-704 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 7-705 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 7-705.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 7-706 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 7-708 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 607.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |