IL SB3558 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-17)
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-17)
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Imposes an assessment for various human trafficking offenses be collected and distributed in accordance with the Specialized Services for Survivors of Human Trafficking Fund. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Makes changes concerning forfeiture for individuals convicted of keeping a place of prostitution. Modifies the allocation percentages of moneys and sale proceeds forfeited by individuals convicted of involuntary servitude and trafficking of persons. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary may issue special registration plates designated as "Support Survivors of Human Trafficking" license plates. Sets forth registration and fee requirements.
Title
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-21 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1013 |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2014-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2014-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2014-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2014-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2014-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2014-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross |
2014-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2014-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2014-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 015-000-000 |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2014-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi |
2014-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2014-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2014-05-01 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2014-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2014-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2014-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2014-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2014-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 8, 2014 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.855 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 5 | 10-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-14.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-14.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 36.5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 124B-300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 124B-305 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-9-1.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |