IL SB3539 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Status: Introduced on February 14 2014 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-04-11 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Smart Phone Kill Switch Act. Requires any smart phone that is manufactured after the effective date of the Act and is sold or purchased at retail in this State to be equipped with the capability to render that smart phone completely inoperable if the phone is lost or stolen. Prohibits wireless telephone service providers and wireless telephone equipment manufacturers from charging any additional fee for a smart phone that has the capability of rendering the smart phone completely inoperable if it is lost or stolen. Provides a definition of "smart phone". Requires a wireless telephone service provider to insure a smart phone against theft if the wireless telephone service provider provides service to a smart phone that does not have the capability of rendering the phone completely inoperable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SMART PHONE KILL SWITCH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2014-03-28SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014
2014-03-27SenatePostponed - Executive
2014-03-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2014-03-05SenateAssigned to Executive
2014-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2014-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2014-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback