IL SB3502 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that substances containing ephedrine or pseudoephedrine, their salts or optical isomers, or salts of optical isomers, are Schedule III controlled substances and require a prescription.
Title
CRIM-PSEUDOEPHEDRINE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 1, 2014 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Re-assigned to Criminal Law |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 208 | Amended Code | Citation Text |