IL SB3448 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0974
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0974
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the Department of Revenue shall give notice at least 60 days (instead of 120 days) before the expiration date of a certificate of registration if the certificate of registration will not be renewed because the taxpayer is in default for delinquent returns or for moneys due under any State tax law or municipal or county ordinance administered or enforced by the Department of Revenue.
Title
ROTA-REGISTRATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0974 |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-001-001 |
2014-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-05-14 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-05-14 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-000-000 |
2014-04-24 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-04-04 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2014-04-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 120 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |