IL SB3395 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a health plan that provides coverage for prescription drugs shall ensure that (1) any required copayment or coinsurance applicable to drugs on a specialty tier does not exceed $100 per month for up to a 30-day supply of any single drug and (2) required copayment or coinsurance for drugs on a specialty tier does not exceed, in the aggregate for those specialty tier covered drugs, $200 per month per enrollee. Provides that a health plan that provides coverage for prescription drugs and utilizes a tiered formulary shall implement an exceptions process that allows enrollees to request an exception to the tiered cost-sharing structure. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2015.
Title
INS CD-SPECIALTY TIER RX
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Michael Noland [D] | Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Sen. Dan Kotowski [D] | Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. William Delgado [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-27 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Insurance Mandates and Special Issues |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3395&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3395.htm |