IL SB3329 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hydraulic Fracturing Regulatory Act. Establishes insurance requirements for operators when submitting a registration form. Authorizes the Department of Natural Resources to establish separate insurance requirements by rule if necessary. Adds references to "horizontal drilling with fracturing operations". Changes bonding requirements. Authorizes the Department to establish separate bonding requirements by rule.
Title
FRACKING-RISK MGMT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EN) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Energy |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 732 | 1-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 732 | 1-65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3329&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3329.htm |