IL SB3294 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code and the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a household goods recycling bin shall have a permanent, written, printed label affixed to the bin and prominently displayed. Sets forth the required information that must be contained within the label. Defines required terms. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOVT-RECYCLING BINS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1116 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-001-000 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 010-003-000 |
2014-05-26 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government |
2014-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 23, 2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2014-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-003-000 |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2014-05-13 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2014-05-13 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2014-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 005-000-000 |
2014-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2014-04-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-04-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-004-000 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 008-002-000 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1183 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-42-16 | New Code | See Bill Text |