IL SB3265 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that a court services fee shall not exceed $25 unless the fee is set according to an acceptable cost study under the Code.
Title
CTY CD-COURT SERVICES FEE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1167 |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-12-04 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Senate Concurs 048-000-000 |
2014-12-04 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 5 - December 2, 2014 |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 5 |
2014-11-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-11-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000 |
2014-11-20 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-11-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted |
2014-11-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 019-000-000 |
2014-11-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2014-11-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2014-11-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
2014-11-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2014-11-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
2014-11-06 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-06 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2014-11-06 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John E. Bradley |
2014-05-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-05-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2014-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2014-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2014-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2014-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2014-05-16 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2014-04-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-013-000 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-003-000 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |