IL SB3262 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0964
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0964
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that delinquent motor fuel use taxes shall bear interest at the rate established by the International Motor Fuel Tax Agreement (currently, 1% per month). Removes a requirement that certain motor carriers are required to make tax payments to the Department by certified check. Effective immediately.
Title
MOTOR FUEL-IFTA
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0964 |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Effective Date August 15, 2014 |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-002-000 |
2014-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-05-14 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-05-14 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-000-000 |
2014-04-24 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2014-04-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2014 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 505 | 13a.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |