IL SB2980 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Township Code. Provides that a copy of the full statement of the financial affairs of the township may be provided to the electors at the annual township meeting in lieu of the township clerk reading the statement aloud.
Title
TWP CD-FINANCIAL STATEMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1108 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 011-000-000 |
2014-05-26 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government |
2014-05-21 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-21 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 22, 2014 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2014-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-001-000 |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2014-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2014-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 005-000-000 |
2014-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2014-03-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2014 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 1 | 70-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |