IL SB2808 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Freedom From Location Surveillance Act. Provides that a law enforcement agency shall not obtain current or future location information pertaining to a person or his or her effects without first obtaining a court order based on probable cause to believe that the person whose location information is sought has committed, is committing, or is about to commit a crime or the effect is evidence of a crime, or if the location information is authorized under an arrest warrant issued under the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 to aid in the apprehension or the arrest of the person named in the arrest warrant. An order issued under a finding of probable cause must be limited to a period of 60 days, renewable by the judge upon a showing of good cause for subsequent periods of 60 days. Provides exemptions. Provides that if the court finds by a preponderance of the evidence that a law enforcement agency obtained current or future location information pertaining to a person or his or her effects in violation of the Act, then the information shall be presumed to be inadmissible in any judicial or administrative proceeding. Provides that the State may overcome this presumption by proving the applicability of a judicially recognized exception to the exclusionary rule of the Fourth Amendment to the United States Constitution or Article I, Section 6 of the Illinois Constitution, or by a preponderance of the evidence that the law enforcement officer was acting in good faith and reasonably believed that one or more of the exceptions existed at the time the location information was obtained. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCATION SURVEILLANCE
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Biss [D] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Sen. William Haine [D] |
Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. David Harris [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Rep. Barbara Wheeler [R] |
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1104 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date August 26, 2014 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2014-05-26 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law |
2014-05-20 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-20 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Daniel Biss |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 21, 2014 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2014-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2014-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2014-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 015-000-000 |
2014-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2014-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2014-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann Williams |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2014-04-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Biss |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2014 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |